|
09/27/2024
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 785, Statutes of 2024.
|
|
|
|
09/27/2024
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/12/2024
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2024
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 5776.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2024
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 6970.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/22/2024
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/22/2024
|
Read third time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/08/2024
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/07/2024
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (August 7).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/27/2024
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/26/2024
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 26).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/19/2024
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ELECTIONS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/03/2024
|
Referred to Com. on ELECTIONS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/24/2024
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4186.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2024
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2024
|
Set for hearing May 6.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2024
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 3700.) (April 22).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2024
|
Set for hearing April 22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2024
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2024
|
Re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2024
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2024
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2024
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 16.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2024
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|