|
08/26/2024
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 206, Statutes of 2024.
|
|
|
|
08/26/2024
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2024
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/15/2024
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/15/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 6320.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/08/2024
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/07/2024
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (August 7).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/27/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/29/2024
|
Referred to Com. on AGRI.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/18/2024
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 3672.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2024
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2024
|
Set for hearing April 15.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 3444.) (April 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2024
|
April 2 set for first hearing. Reconsideration of favorable vote granted.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2024
|
Set for hearing April 2.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2024
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 16.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2024
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|