Senate | 04/18/2024 | April 22 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Senate | 04/09/2024 | Set for hearing April 23 in JUD. pending receipt. | ||
Senate | 04/04/2024 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. | ||
Senate | 04/04/2024 | Set for hearing April 22. | ||
Senate | 04/03/2024 | Re-referred to Coms. on HEALTH and JUD. | ||
Senate | 03/19/2024 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 02/21/2024 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 02/15/2024 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 16. | ||
Senate | 02/14/2024 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |