California 2023-2024 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1207 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 15, 2024

Enrolled

Bill August 30, 2024

Chaptered

Bill September 20, 2024

Amended

Bill June 19, 2024
Bill March 20, 2024