Assembly
|
09/01/2024
|
Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 28. Noes 8. Page 7157.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2024
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/15/2024
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (August 15).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/07/2024
|
August 7 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/03/2024
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/02/2024
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 1.) (July 1).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/26/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/03/2024
|
Referred to Coms. on E.S. & T.M. and NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/21/2024
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 28. Noes 6. Page 4029.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2024
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3975.) (May 16).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2024
|
Set for hearing May 16.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2024
|
May 13 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2024
|
Set for hearing May 13.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2024
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 3754.) (April 24).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2024
|
Set for hearing April 24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2024
|
April 17 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2024
|
Set for hearing April 17.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/29/2024
|
Referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2024
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 17.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2024
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|