|
09/27/2024
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 787, Statutes of 2024.
|
|
|
|
09/27/2024
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/03/2024
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/26/2024
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 34. Noes 6. Page 5414.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/20/2024
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 60. Noes 2. Page 6380.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/08/2024
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/07/2024
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 10. Noes 1.) (August 7).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/26/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/24/2024
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/20/2024
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. (Ayes 13. Noes 1.) (June 19).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/20/2024
|
Assembly Rule 56 suspended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/03/2024
|
Referred to Coms. on U. & E. and L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/22/2024
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 33. Noes 5. Page 4079.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2024
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2024
|
Set for hearing May 6.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2024
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2024
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3663.) (April 17).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2024
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2024
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. (Ayes 15. Noes 1. Page 3445.) (April 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2024
|
Set for hearing April 17 in L. GOV. pending receipt.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2024
|
Set for hearing April 2.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2024
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E., U. & C.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/29/2024
|
Referred to Coms. on E., U. & C. and L. GOV.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2024
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 17.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2024
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|