Assembly
|
08/15/2024
|
August 15 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/07/2024
|
August 7 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/25/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/18/2024
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on W., P., & W.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/03/2024
|
Referred to Com. on W., P., & W.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/24/2024
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4210.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2024
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2024
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2024
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2024
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3976.) (May 16).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2024
|
Set for hearing May 16.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2024
|
May 6 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2024
|
Set for hearing May 6.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 3729.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2024
|
Set for hearing April 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/29/2024
|
Referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2024
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 17.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2024
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|