LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2023-2024 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB1229
Action History
CA
California Senate Bill SB1229
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2023-2024 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB1229
Action History
Senate
04/24/2024
April 24 set for first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 1. Noes 3. Page 3757.)
Senate
04/17/2024
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on INS.
Senate
04/12/2024
Set for hearing April 24.
Senate
02/29/2024
Referred to Com. on INS.
Senate
02/16/2024
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 17.
Senate
02/15/2024
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.