Senate | 05/16/2024 | May 16 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. | ||
Senate | 05/10/2024 | Set for hearing May 16. | ||
Senate | 04/15/2024 | April 15 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. | ||
Senate | 04/05/2024 | Set for hearing April 15. | ||
Senate | 04/02/2024 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 3428.) (April 1). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 03/12/2024 | Set for hearing April 1. | ||
Senate | 02/29/2024 | Referred to Com. on HUMAN S. | ||
Senate | 02/16/2024 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 17. | ||
Senate | 02/15/2024 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |