|
09/22/2024
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 464, Statutes of 2024.
|
|
|
|
09/22/2024
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/03/2024
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/27/2024
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 5509.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/20/2024
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 69. Noes 0. Page 6377.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/06/2024
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/05/2024
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/03/2024
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (July 1).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/17/2024
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on U. & E.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/13/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on U. & E. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 12). Re-referred to Com. on U. & E.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/03/2024
|
Referred to Coms. on L. GOV. and U. & E.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/22/2024
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 4096.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2024
|
Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2024
|
Withdrawn from committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2024
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2024
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0. Page 3701.) (April 22).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2024
|
Set for hearing April 22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on E., U. & C. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 3469.) (April 3). Re-referred to Com. on E., U. & C.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2024
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2024
|
Set for hearing April 3.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/29/2024
|
Referred to Coms. on L. GOV. and E., U. & C.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2024
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 17.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2024
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|