|
09/27/2024
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 790, Statutes of 2024.
|
|
|
|
09/27/2024
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/10/2024
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2024
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 5737.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/29/2024
|
From committee: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 5699.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/28/2024
|
From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on JUD. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d). (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 5566.) Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/28/2024
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/28/2024
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/28/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 6702.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/22/2024
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/22/2024
|
Read third time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2024
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/15/2024
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (August 15).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/07/2024
|
August 7 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/26/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/19/2024
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/19/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on E.S. & T.M. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (June 18). Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/06/2024
|
Re-referred to Coms. on HEALTH and E.S. & T.M. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/03/2024
|
Referred to Coms. on E.S. & T.M. and HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/21/2024
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 4020.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2024
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2024
|
Set for hearing May 13.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2024
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 3702.) (April 22).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2024
|
Set for hearing April 22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2024
|
April 24 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2024
|
Set for hearing April 24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2024
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2024
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3467.) (April 3).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2024
|
Set for hearing April 3.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/29/2024
|
Referred to Coms. on E.Q. and HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2024
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 17.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2024
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|