Senate | 04/15/2024 | April 24 set for second hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Senate | 04/03/2024 | Set for hearing April 24. | ||
Senate | 03/12/2024 | March 20 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Senate | 03/01/2024 | Set for hearing March 20. | ||
Senate | 02/29/2024 | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. | ||
Senate | 02/16/2024 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 17. | ||
Senate | 02/15/2024 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |