Assembly | 08/27/2024 | Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 08/27/2024 | Read third time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 08/27/2024 | Assembly Rule 69(b)(1) suspended. | ||
Assembly | 08/27/2024 | Joint Rule 61(b)(16) suspended. (Ayes 63. Noes 0. Page 6657.) | ||
Assembly | 06/25/2024 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 06/24/2024 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. | ||
Assembly | 06/20/2024 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 3.) (June 18). | ||
Assembly | 05/28/2024 | Referred to Com. on P. & C.P. | ||
Assembly | 05/22/2024 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 05/21/2024 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 30. Noes 6. Page 4048.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 04/10/2024 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 2. Page 3531.) (April 9). | ||
Senate | 04/01/2024 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | ||
Senate | 03/28/2024 | Set for hearing April 9. | ||
Senate | 02/29/2024 | Referred to Com. on JUD. | ||
Senate | 02/16/2024 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 17. | ||
Senate | 02/15/2024 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |