|
06/26/2024
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 30, Statutes of 2024.
|
|
|
|
06/26/2024
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
06/19/2024
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11 a.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2024
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/13/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 5860.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/06/2024
|
(Corrected June 6.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/06/2024
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/05/2024
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (June 5).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/05/2024
|
Coauthors revised.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/20/2024
|
Referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/13/2024
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 3893.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2024
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0. Page 3722.) (April 23).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2024
|
Set for hearing April 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2024
|
Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2024
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/29/2024
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2024
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 17.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2024
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|