|
09/22/2024
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 466, Statutes of 2024.
|
|
|
|
09/22/2024
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/09/2024
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/29/2024
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 31. Noes 9. Page 5651.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/28/2024
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/28/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 49. Noes 16. Page 6802.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/20/2024
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2024
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/15/2024
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 3.) (August 15).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/07/2024
|
August 7 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/18/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (June 17). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/03/2024
|
Referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/22/2024
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 32. Noes 7. Page 4076.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2024
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2024
|
Set for hearing April 22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2024
|
April 15 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2024
|
Set for hearing April 15.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2024
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2024
|
Withdrawn from committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 4. Noes 2. Page 3467.) (April 3). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2024
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2024
|
Set for hearing April 3.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/29/2024
|
Referred to Coms. on E.Q. and JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2024
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 17.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2024
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|