California 2023-2024 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1286 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 15, 2024

Enrolled

Bill September 5, 2024

Chaptered

Bill September 24, 2024

Amended

Bill August 23, 2024
Bill July 3, 2024
Bill April 25, 2024
Bill March 18, 2024