Assembly
|
08/28/2024
|
Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Bonta.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/12/2024
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/12/2024
|
From consent calendar on motion of Assembly Member Aguiar-Curry.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/08/2024
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/07/2024
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (August 7).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/26/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/28/2024
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/21/2024
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 4013.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2024
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2024
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2024
|
Set for hearing April 22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 3561.) (April 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2024
|
Set for hearing April 10.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2024
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 17.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2024
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|