California 2023-2024 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1292 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 15, 2024

Enrolled

Bill September 3, 2024

Amended

Bill July 3, 2024
Bill June 23, 2024
Bill April 30, 2024