Senate | 05/16/2024 | May 16 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. | ||
Senate | 05/14/2024 | Set for hearing May 16. | ||
Senate | 05/13/2024 | May 13 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. | ||
Senate | 05/08/2024 | Set for hearing May 13. | ||
Senate | 05/06/2024 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Joint Rule 10.5. | ||
Senate | 05/02/2024 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to consent calendar. | ||
Senate | 05/01/2024 | From committee: Do pass as amended. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 3820.) (April 30). | ||
Senate | 04/16/2024 | Set for hearing April 30. | ||
Senate | 04/08/2024 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | ||
Senate | 04/04/2024 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3444.) (April 2). | ||
Senate | 03/15/2024 | Set for hearing April 2. | ||
Senate | 02/29/2024 | Referred to Coms. on E. & C.A. and JUD. | ||
Senate | 02/16/2024 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 17. | ||
Senate | 02/15/2024 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |