Senate | 04/23/2024 | April 22 set for second hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 1. Noes 1. Page 3700.) | ||
Senate | 04/17/2024 | Set for hearing April 22. | ||
Senate | 04/16/2024 | April 16 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Senate | 04/05/2024 | Set for hearing April 16. | ||
Senate | 04/03/2024 | Re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A. | ||
Senate | 03/20/2024 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 02/29/2024 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 02/16/2024 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 17. | ||
Senate | 02/15/2024 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |