Senate | 05/16/2024 | May 16 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. | ||
Senate | 05/14/2024 | Set for hearing May 16. | ||
Senate | 05/13/2024 | May 13 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. | ||
Senate | 05/06/2024 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 05/03/2024 | Set for hearing May 13. | ||
Senate | 04/29/2024 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 04/25/2024 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3754.) (April 24). | ||
Senate | 04/17/2024 | Set for hearing April 24. | ||
Senate | 04/16/2024 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on E.Q. (Ayes 12. Noes 0. Page 3605.) (April 15). Re-referred to Com. on E.Q. | ||
Senate | 04/05/2024 | Set for hearing April 15. | ||
Senate | 04/03/2024 | Re-referred to Coms. on B., P. & E. D. and E.Q. | ||
Senate | 03/18/2024 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 02/29/2024 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 02/16/2024 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 17. | ||
Senate | 02/15/2024 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |