|
09/20/2024
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 326, Statutes of 2024.
|
|
|
|
09/20/2024
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/04/2024
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/28/2024
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5615.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/27/2024
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/26/2024
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/26/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 6512.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/22/2024
|
Read third time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/22/2024
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/15/2024
|
From consent calendar on motion of Assembly Member McCarty.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/08/2024
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/07/2024
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (August 7).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/18/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/18/2024
|
Coauthors revised.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/28/2024
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/21/2024
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 4021.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2024
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2024
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2024
|
Set for hearing May 13.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Joint Rule 10.5.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2024
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2024
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 3637.) (April 16).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2024
|
Set for hearing April 16.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/29/2024
|
Referred to Com. on PUB S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2024
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 18.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2024
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|