Assembly
|
08/15/2024
|
August 15 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/07/2024
|
August 7 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/26/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/19/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 18). Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/03/2024
|
Referred to Coms. on HIGHER ED. and HUM. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/24/2024
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4211.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2024
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2024
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2024
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2024
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3979.) (May 16).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2024
|
Set for hearing May 16.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2024
|
April 15 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2024
|
Set for hearing April 15.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 3428.) (April 1). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HUMAN S. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3378.) (March 20). Re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2024
|
Set for hearing April 1 in HUMAN S. pending receipt.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2024
|
Set for hearing March 20.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/29/2024
|
Referred to Coms. on ED. and HUMAN S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2024
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 18.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2024
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|