|
09/22/2024
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 470, Statutes of 2024.
|
|
|
|
09/22/2024
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/03/2024
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/26/2024
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/26/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 6536.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2024
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/15/2024
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (August 15).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/07/2024
|
August 7 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/02/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (July 1). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/25/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/03/2024
|
Referred to Coms. on W., P., & W. and NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2024
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 3920.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2024
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2024
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2024
|
Set for hearing May 13.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3754.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2024
|
Set for hearing April 24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2024
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2024
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on E.Q. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 3533.) (April 9).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2024
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2024
|
Set for hearing April 9.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/29/2024
|
Referred to Coms. on N.R. & W. and E.Q.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2024
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 18.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2024
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|