Assembly
|
08/15/2024
|
August 15 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/07/2024
|
August 7 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/26/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/03/2024
|
Referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/23/2024
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 30. Noes 8. Page 4139.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2024
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2024
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3980.) (May 16).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2024
|
Set for hearing May 16.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2024
|
April 29 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2024
|
Set for hearing April 29.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3664.) (April 17). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2024
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. (Ayes 9. Noes 5. Page 3529.) (April 9). Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2024
|
Set for hearing April 17 in L. GOV. pending receipt.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2024
|
Set for hearing April 9.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/29/2024
|
Referred to Coms. on G.O. and L. GOV.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2024
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 18.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2024
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|