Assembly | 08/12/2024 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. | ||
Assembly | 08/08/2024 | Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. | ||
Assembly | 06/27/2024 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 06/27/2024 | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 27. Noes 7. Page 4796.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 05/20/2024 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 05/16/2024 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. | ||
Senate | 05/16/2024 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 4. Noes 2. Page 3980.) (May 16). | ||
Senate | 05/14/2024 | Set for hearing May 16. | ||
Senate | 05/13/2024 | May 13 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. | ||
Senate | 05/09/2024 | Set for hearing May 13. | ||
Senate | 05/08/2024 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1. Page 3865.) (May 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 05/02/2024 | Set for hearing May 8. | ||
Senate | 04/23/2024 | April 24 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Senate | 04/22/2024 | Set for hearing April 24. | ||
Senate | 04/03/2024 | Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. | ||
Senate | 03/20/2024 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 02/29/2024 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 02/20/2024 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 18. | ||
Senate | 02/16/2024 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |