Assembly
|
08/31/2024
|
Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Aguiar-Curry.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2024
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/15/2024
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 3.) (August 15).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/02/2024
|
July 2 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/26/2024
|
June 26 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/11/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 3.) (June 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/03/2024
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/22/2024
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 30. Noes 7. Page 4068.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2024
|
Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 4068.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2024
|
Motion to reconsider made by Senator Bradford.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 29. Noes 8. Page 4067.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2024
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2024
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3980.) (May 16).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2024
|
Set for hearing May 16.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2024
|
May 13 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2024
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2024
|
Set for hearing May 13.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 1. Page 3636.) (April 16). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2024
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2024
|
Set for hearing April 16.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2024
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 18.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2024
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|