|
09/22/2024
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 472, Statutes of 2024.
|
|
|
|
09/22/2024
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/04/2024
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/28/2024
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5611.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/27/2024
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/22/2024
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/22/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 62. Noes 0. Page 6447.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/15/2024
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/15/2024
|
From consent calendar on motion of Assembly Member Zbur.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/08/2024
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/07/2024
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (August 7).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/03/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (July 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/20/2024
|
Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/19/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (June 18). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/04/2024
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/03/2024
|
Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/24/2024
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4182.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2024
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2024
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3980.) (May 16).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2024
|
Set for hearing May 16.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2024
|
April 22 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2024
|
Set for hearing April 22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 3531.) (April 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2024
|
Set for hearing April 9.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 3380.) (March 20). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2024
|
Set for hearing March 20.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2024
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 18.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2024
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|