|
09/26/2024
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 626, Statutes of 2024.
|
|
|
|
09/26/2024
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/10/2024
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2024
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 31. Noes 9. Page 5733.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2024
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/29/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 62. Noes 11. Page 6886.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/23/2024
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/23/2024
|
Read third time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/20/2024
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2024
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/15/2024
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 3.) (August 15).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/07/2024
|
August 7 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/03/2024
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/02/2024
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 3.) (July 2).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/20/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 19). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/03/2024
|
Referred to Coms. on L. & E. and JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/22/2024
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 30. Noes 8. Page 4071.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2024
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3980.) (May 16).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2024
|
Set for hearing May 16.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2024
|
May 13 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2024
|
Set for hearing May 13.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2024
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 3758.) (April 24).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on L., P.E. & R. (Ayes 9. Noes 2. Page 3636.) (April 16). Re-referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2024
|
Set for hearing April 24 in L., P.E. & R. pending receipt.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2024
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2024
|
Set for hearing April 16.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2024
|
Re-referred to Coms. on JUD. and L., P.E. & R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2024
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2024
|
Withdrawn from committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/29/2024
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2024
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 18.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2024
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|