Assembly | 08/15/2024 | August 15 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. | ||
Assembly | 07/02/2024 | July 2 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file. | ||
Assembly | 06/13/2024 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 06/03/2024 | Referred to Com. on ED. | ||
Assembly | 05/24/2024 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 05/23/2024 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4182.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 05/20/2024 | Ordered to special consent calendar. | ||
Senate | 05/16/2024 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 05/16/2024 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3980.) (May 16). | ||
Senate | 05/10/2024 | Set for hearing May 16. | ||
Senate | 04/08/2024 | April 8 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. | ||
Senate | 04/02/2024 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 03/28/2024 | Set for hearing April 8. | ||
Senate | 03/20/2024 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3378.) (March 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 03/07/2024 | Set for hearing March 20. | ||
Senate | 02/20/2024 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 18. | ||
Senate | 02/16/2024 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |