|
09/26/2024
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 627, Statutes of 2024.
|
|
|
|
09/26/2024
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/09/2024
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/29/2024
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 5653.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/28/2024
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/28/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 69. Noes 0. Page 6803.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/20/2024
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2024
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/15/2024
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (August 15).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/07/2024
|
August 7 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/03/2024
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/03/2024
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (July 2).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/03/2024
|
Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/24/2024
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 4192.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2024
|
Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2024
|
Read third time and amended.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2024
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2024
|
Set for hearing April 29.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 3659.) (April 17). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2024
|
Set for hearing April 17.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2024
|
Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2024
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/29/2024
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2024
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 18.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2024
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|