|
03/25/2024
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 6, Statutes of 2024.
|
|
|
|
03/25/2024
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
03/21/2024
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2024
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 29. Noes 3. Page 3384.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2024
|
Urgency clause adopted.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2024
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/18/2024
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 58. Noes 11. Page 4397.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/12/2024
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/11/2024
|
Withdrawn from committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/11/2024
|
Assembly Rule 96 suspended. (Ayes 53. Noes 14. Page 4315.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/11/2024
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/11/2024
|
Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/30/2023
|
Referred to Com. on BUDGET.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/27/2023
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 29. Noes 8. Page 497.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2023
|
Withdrawn from committee. (Ayes 28. Noes 8. Page 357.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2023
|
Referred to Com. on B. & F.R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/19/2023
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 18.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/18/2023
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|