|
09/25/2024
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 606, Statutes of 2024.
|
|
|
|
09/25/2024
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/10/2024
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2024
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 5749.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/29/2024
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/28/2024
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/28/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 6687.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/24/2024
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/20/2024
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (June 19).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/12/2024
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/13/2024
|
Referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/02/2024
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 3829.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2024
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0. Page 3723.) (April 23).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2024
|
Set for hearing April 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2024
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 18.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2024
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|