Assembly | 07/01/2024 | July 1 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Assembly | 06/18/2024 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. | ||
Assembly | 06/03/2024 | Referred to Com. on TRANS. | ||
Assembly | 05/23/2024 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 05/22/2024 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 26. Noes 7. Page 4132.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 05/14/2024 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 05/13/2024 | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. | ||
Senate | 05/03/2024 | Set for hearing May 13. | ||
Senate | 04/30/2024 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 04/29/2024 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 4. Page 3733.) (April 23). | ||
Senate | 04/02/2024 | Set for hearing April 23. | ||
Senate | 04/01/2024 | April 9 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Senate | 03/06/2024 | Set for hearing April 9. | ||
Senate | 02/20/2024 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 18. | ||
Senate | 02/16/2024 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |