California 2023-2024 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1375 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 16, 2024

Enrolled

Bill September 3, 2024

Amended

Bill August 22, 2024
Bill August 19, 2024
Bill April 15, 2024