Senate | 05/16/2024 | May 16 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. | ||
Senate | 05/10/2024 | Set for hearing May 16. | ||
Senate | 05/06/2024 | May 6 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. | ||
Senate | 04/26/2024 | Set for hearing May 6. | ||
Senate | 04/24/2024 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 2. Page 3752.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 04/05/2024 | Set for hearing April 24. | ||
Senate | 04/04/2024 | April 17 hearing postponed by committee. | ||
Senate | 04/04/2024 | Set for hearing April 17. | ||
Senate | 04/03/2024 | Re-referred to Com. on ED. | ||
Senate | 03/18/2024 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 02/29/2024 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 02/20/2024 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 18. | ||
Senate | 02/16/2024 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |