Senate | 04/18/2024 | April 23 set for second hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Senate | 04/11/2024 | Set for hearing April 23. | ||
Senate | 04/09/2024 | April 9 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Senate | 03/13/2024 | Set for hearing April 9. | ||
Senate | 02/29/2024 | Referred to Com. on PUB S. | ||
Senate | 02/20/2024 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 18. | ||
Senate | 02/16/2024 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |