|
09/19/2024
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 297, Statutes of 2024.
|
|
|
|
09/19/2024
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/23/2024
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/20/2024
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 6376.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/05/2024
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/05/2024
|
From consent calendar on motion of Assembly Member Hart.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/03/2024
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/02/2024
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (July 2).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/25/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/12/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 12). Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/12/2024
|
Coauthors revised.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/03/2024
|
Referred to Coms. on H. & C.D. and NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/13/2024
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 3894.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2024
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2024
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2024
|
Set for hearing April 29.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2024
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2024
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3661.) (April 17).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2024
|
Set for hearing April 17.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on E.Q. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 3350.) (March 19). Re-referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2024
|
Set for hearing March 19.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/29/2024
|
Referred to Coms. on HOUSING and E.Q.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2024
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 18.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2024
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|