Assembly | 06/25/2024 | June 25 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Assembly | 06/03/2024 | Referred to Com. on HUM. S. | ||
Assembly | 05/22/2024 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 05/21/2024 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 4048.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 04/16/2024 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 04/15/2024 | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. | ||
Senate | 04/05/2024 | Set for hearing April 15. | ||
Senate | 04/02/2024 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 3428.) (April 1). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 03/12/2024 | Set for hearing April 1. | ||
Senate | 02/29/2024 | Referred to Com. on HUMAN S. | ||
Senate | 02/20/2024 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 18. | ||
Senate | 02/16/2024 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |