California 2023-2024 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1419 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 16, 2024

Enrolled

Bill September 5, 2024

Amended

Bill August 19, 2024
Bill April 23, 2024
Bill March 20, 2024