Senate
|
09/22/2024
|
In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/22/2024
|
Vetoed by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/04/2024
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/28/2024
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5591.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/28/2024
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/26/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 6521.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/22/2024
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/22/2024
|
Read third time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2024
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/15/2024
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (August 15).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/07/2024
|
August 7 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/27/2024
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/26/2024
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (June 25).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/03/2024
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/23/2024
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4149.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2024
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2024
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3983.) (May 16).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2024
|
Set for hearing May 16.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2024
|
May 6 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2024
|
Set for hearing May 6.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2024
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 3756.) (April 24).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2024
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2024
|
Set for hearing April 24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2024
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 18.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2024
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|