|
09/25/2024
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 609, Statutes of 2024.
|
|
|
|
09/25/2024
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/04/2024
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/29/2024
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/28/2024
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 6700.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2024
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/15/2024
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (August 15).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/02/2024
|
July 2 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/18/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 17). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/03/2024
|
Referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/24/2024
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2024
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4211.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2024
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2024
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2024
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3983.) (May 16).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2024
|
Set for hearing May 16.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2024
|
April 29 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2024
|
Set for hearing April 29.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 3608.) (April 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2024
|
Set for hearing April 15.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2024
|
Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2024
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/29/2024
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2024
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 18.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2024
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|