|
08/19/2024
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 190, Statutes of 2024.
|
|
|
|
08/19/2024
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/13/2024
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/08/2024
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/08/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 72. Noes 0. Page 6250.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/03/2024
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/02/2024
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (July 2).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/26/2024
|
June 26 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/04/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 4). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/20/2024
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/09/2024
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 3874.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2024
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2024
|
Set for hearing May 6.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2024
|
April 29 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2024
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2024
|
Set for hearing April 29.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2024
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2024
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 3448.) (April 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2024
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2024
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 18.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2024
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|