Senate | 04/24/2024 | April 24 set for first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 2. Noes 3. Page 3752.) | ||
Senate | 04/23/2024 | Set for hearing April 24. | ||
Senate | 04/22/2024 | Joint Rule 62(a) suspended. | ||
Senate | 04/22/2024 | April 17 set for first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 2. Noes 3. Page 3660.) Reconsideration granted. | ||
Senate | 04/16/2024 | Set for hearing April 23 in JUD. pending receipt. | ||
Senate | 04/08/2024 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED. | ||
Senate | 04/04/2024 | Set for hearing April 17. | ||
Senate | 04/03/2024 | Re-referred to Coms. on ED. and JUD. | ||
Senate | 03/18/2024 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 02/29/2024 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 02/20/2024 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 18. | ||
Senate | 02/16/2024 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |