Senate | 05/16/2024 | May 16 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. | ||
Senate | 05/10/2024 | Set for hearing May 16. | ||
Senate | 05/06/2024 | May 6 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. | ||
Senate | 04/26/2024 | Set for hearing May 6. | ||
Senate | 04/24/2024 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 04/23/2024 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 1. Page 3723.) (April 23). | ||
Senate | 04/16/2024 | Set for hearing April 23. | ||
Senate | 04/10/2024 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on G.O. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 3564.) (April 10). Re-referred to Com. on G.O. | ||
Senate | 04/04/2024 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. | ||
Senate | 03/19/2024 | Set for hearing April 10. | ||
Senate | 02/29/2024 | Referred to Coms. on REV. & TAX. and G.O. | ||
Senate | 02/20/2024 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 18. | ||
Senate | 02/16/2024 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |