Assembly
|
08/15/2024
|
August 15 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/02/2024
|
July 2 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/26/2024
|
June 26 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/13/2024
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/12/2024
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (June 11).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/03/2024
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/23/2024
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4135.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2024
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2024
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2024
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3983.) (May 16).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2024
|
Set for hearing May 16.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2024
|
April 22 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2024
|
Set for hearing April 22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 3562.) (April 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2024
|
Set for hearing April 10.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2024
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2024
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 18.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2024
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|