California 2023-2024 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1459 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 16, 2024

Amended

Bill June 26, 2024
Bill May 16, 2024
Bill April 23, 2024
Bill April 17, 2024
Bill April 11, 2024
Bill March 20, 2024