|
09/22/2024
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 488, Statutes of 2024.
|
|
|
|
09/22/2024
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/27/2024
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/22/2024
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 5297.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/20/2024
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/15/2024
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/15/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 6321.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/08/2024
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/07/2024
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (August 7).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/26/2024
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/25/2024
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (June 25).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/03/2024
|
Referred to Com. on B. & P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/23/2024
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4136.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2024
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2024
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2024
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3985.) (May 16).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2024
|
Set for hearing May 16.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2024
|
April 29 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2024
|
Set for hearing April 29.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2024
|
April 22 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2024
|
Set for hearing April 22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 3511.) (April 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2024
|
Set for hearing April 8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2024
|
Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E. D.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2024
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/29/2024
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2024
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 18.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2024
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|