Assembly
|
08/26/2024
|
Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Grayson.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/20/2024
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2024
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/15/2024
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (August 15).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/07/2024
|
August 7 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/02/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (July 1). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/25/2024
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/03/2024
|
Referred to Com. on B. & F.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/22/2024
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 4072.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2024
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 1. Page 3985.) (May 16).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2024
|
Set for hearing May 16.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2024
|
May 6 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2024
|
Set for hearing May 6.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 1. Page 3727.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 3659.) (April 17). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2024
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.I.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2024
|
Set for hearing April 23 in JUD. pending receipt.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2024
|
Set for hearing April 17.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2024
|
April 3 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2024
|
Set for hearing April 3.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/29/2024
|
Referred to Coms. on B. & F.I. and JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2024
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 18.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2024
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|