Assembly | 08/15/2024 | Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 08/15/2024 | From consent calendar on motion of Assembly Member Aguiar-Curry. | ||
Assembly | 08/08/2024 | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. | ||
Assembly | 08/07/2024 | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (August 7). | ||
Assembly | 06/04/2024 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 4). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 05/20/2024 | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. | ||
Assembly | 05/16/2024 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 05/16/2024 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 3920.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 05/13/2024 | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. | ||
Senate | 05/03/2024 | Set for hearing May 13. | ||
Senate | 04/09/2024 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 3534.) (April 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 03/28/2024 | Set for hearing April 9. | ||
Senate | 03/20/2024 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB S. | ||
Senate | 02/29/2024 | Referred to Com. on PUB S. | ||
Senate | 02/20/2024 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 18. | ||
Senate | 02/16/2024 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |